# CLASS-4Multiplying a number by 10, 100, 1000

Multiplying a number by 10, 100, 1000, etc. -

¨    Multiplication by 10

1.   a) 354 x 10 = 3540              (One zero is added at the end)

b) 2,678 x 10 = 26,780

¨    Multiplication by 100

2.   a) 437 x 100 = 43,700         (Two zeroes are added at the end)

b) 82,347 x 100 = 82,34,700

¨    Multiplication by 1000

3.   a) 362 x 1000 = 3,62,000      (Three zeroes are added at the end)

b) 7,646 x 1000 = 76,46,000

Some Other Important Results -

In case of multiplying two numbers where both the number contains zero, then in obtain product we will put all or sum of given number of 0 (zero) along with.

a)  12,500 x 50 = 6,25,000

or, (125 X 5) X 1000 = 6,25,000

b)  3,210 X 2,000 = 64,20,000

or, (321 X 2) X 10, 000 = 64,20,000

c)   240 X 50 = 12,000

or, (24 X 5) X 100 = 120 X 100 = 12,000

d)  4500 X 600 = 27,00,000

or, (45 X 6) X 10,000 = 270 X 10,000 = 27,00,000

e)  12400 X 250 = 31,00,000

or, (124 X 25) X 1000 = 3100 X 1000 = 31,00,000

1) Some other way of multiplication by 10, 100, 1000.